open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02488
    Party Name:Young v. Stancil
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?191533
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =