open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02548
    Party Name:Spain v. Mesa County Detention Facility
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?191639
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =