U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-po-07008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kaganas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Suppress ]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 13, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.