U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00105
  • Case Name: United States Department of Justice v. State of Colorado Board of Pharmacy et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • December 13, 2019: [File Amicus Brief]
  • December 06, 2019: [Hearing/Conference]
  • December 06, 2019: [Leave to Restrict]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Minute Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.