U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00113
  • Case Name: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kimmel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Hearing/Conference]
  • June 22, 2020: [Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 18, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.