U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00070
  • Case Name: In re: Michael Obere Ebiala
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Minute Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2020: [Extension of Time]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.