open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:19-20316-
    Party Name:Wael Awad
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Fees and Expenses (Application) and Notice]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Virtual Order: Confirming Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Verification of Confirmable Plan]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Certificate of Non-Contested Matter]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Stipulation (Relief From Stay)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Stipulation (To Relief From Stay)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Approve]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Extend Time]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [9013-1.1 Notice]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Employ]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Extend Time (Bankruptcy)]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Notice of Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Reschedule Hearing]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Response]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Notice of Mortgage Payment Changes]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Dismiss Case and 9013-1.1 Notice (Chapter 13 Trustee)(Batch)(Failure To Make Plan Payments)]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Relief from Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [3015 Notice]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Notice of Financial Management and/or Domestic Support Obligation Certificate]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Confirmation Status Report]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Objection to Confirmation/Modification of Plan]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Set Notice of Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income & Commitment Period Form (122C-1)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?490194
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =