open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03215
    Party Name:Matthews v. Geico Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct/Modify]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?193254
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =