U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-rj-00015
  • Case Name: Arjo Inc. v. Arjo-Century Distributing, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Issuance]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Issuance]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • February 21, 2020: [Release of Funds]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • December 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.