U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00129
  • Case Name: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Change Venue]
  • December 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 17, 2019: [Leave to Restrict]
  • December 17, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.