U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00131
  • Case Name: Flexential Colorado Corp. v. Switch, LTD.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • February 20, 2020: [Vacate]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 27, 2020: [Vacate]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Minute Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 19, 2019: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.