U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00136
  • Case Name: Peterson et al v. Arrow Electronics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 10, 2020: [Withdraw]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 09, 2020: [Withdraw]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.