U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00011
  • Case Name: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Minute Order]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify]
  • February 13, 2020: [Amend/Correct/Modify]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.