U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00046
  • Case Name: In re: General Orders
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.