U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGraw
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Vacate]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Discovery]
  • March 23, 2020: [In Limine]
  • March 23, 2020: [Suppress ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.