U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knetzer
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • May 08, 2020: [Quash]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.