U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benabbas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Vacate]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 15, 2020: [Vacate]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 27, 2020: [Vacate]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 08, 2020: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.