U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kubicki
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Violation Notice]
  • May 04, 2021: [Dismiss Comp/Violation Notice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 09, 2021: [Release from Custody]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Stay]
  • November 04, 2020: [Stay]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 04, 2020: [Compel]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
  • April 28, 2020: [Bond]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.