U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bunn
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 02, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • May 19, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
  • May 18, 2020: [RETIRED Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Private]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • May 04, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.