U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00073
  • Case Name: KB Oreo, LLC v. Winnerman et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • June 09, 2020: [Leave]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Supplement]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 06, 2020: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.