U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shao
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • January 19, 2021: [Return of Property]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Violation Notice]
  • January 15, 2021: [Dismiss Comp/Violation Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 06, 2020: [Vacate]
  • June 04, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 29, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 26, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • May 22, 2020: [Dismiss Counts]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • May 20, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.