U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-rj-00007
  • Case Name: Alliant Tax Credit Fund 42, LTD et al v. Fairfax Housing Venture LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Leave to Restrict]
  • June 08, 2021: [Hearing/Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • February 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Hearing/Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • December 03, 2020: [Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2020: [Quash]
  • November 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2020: [Set Aside]
  • November 17, 2020: [Vacate]
  • November 05, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • November 04, 2020: [Judgment - Default]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Entry of Default]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.