U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tew
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Modify]
  • September 29, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
  • August 12, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 09, 2020: [RETIRED Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Private]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.