open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:20-15227-
    Party Name:Brian Wolf
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Statement Re: Failure to Comply-Tax Information]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Virtual Order: Compliance With Rule 1009 On Amendments]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Schedule]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Schedule C]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Set Notice of Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income & Commitment Period Form (122C-1)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income & Commitment Period Form (122C-1)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?496502
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =