open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:20-15363-
    Party Name:Zachary Steven Ernest Muth
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Payment of Installment Payment (Chapter 13 - Final)]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Relief from Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Objection to Confirmation/Modification of Plan]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Statement Re: Failure to Comply-Tax Information]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Set Financial Course Due Date (Individual Business)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income & Commitment Period Form (122C-1)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income & Commitment Period Form (122C-1)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?496642
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =