U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00145
  • Case Name: Spider Labs LTD. v. John Doe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • November 06, 2020: [Leave]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • November 02, 2020: [Leave]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • August 14, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.