U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Bond]
  • December 03, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • October 02, 2020: [Leave to Restrict]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 03, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 19, 2020: [Exclude]
  • August 19, 2020: [Vacate]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 17, 2020: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.