U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-po-07016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lesh
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court-cr cases]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 10, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 19, 2021: [Discovery]
  • April 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 01, 2021: [Bond]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 02, 2020: [Bond]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Quash]
  • October 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.