U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00199
  • Case Name: Snyder v. McCloughan et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.