U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-y-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Return of Property]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Suppress ]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Expedite]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Return of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.