U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00140
  • Case Name: Chime Media, LLC et al v. Lynch
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 28, 2021: [Suppress]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Quash]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 08, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • June 07, 2021: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.