U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collofello
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 21, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 02, 2021: [Exclude]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 04, 2021: [Release from Custody]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.