U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00021
  • Case Name: USA v. In Re: $72,566.86 Seized from Bank of America Account #0000000433067200
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.