U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montoya
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Leave to Restrict]
  • October 28, 2022: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • October 20, 2022: [Leave to Restrict]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.