U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tambito-Espinoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Suppress ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 29, 2022: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.