U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00345-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Godding et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • January 10, 2023: [Leave to Restrict]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Reconsideration]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 27, 2022: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 06, 2022: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 06, 2022: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.