U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Separate Trial on Counts]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.