U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [In Limine]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disclose Grand Jury]
  • October 19, 2022: [Disclose Grand Jury]
  • October 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.