U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clements
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.