U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nash
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 23, 2023: [Leave to Restrict]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Suppress ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.