U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00202-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Jani
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • January 17, 2023: [Dismiss Counts]
  • January 17, 2023: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 09, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order re: Report on Offender Under Supervision]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disclose Grand Jury]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Disclose Grand Jury]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • July 27, 2022: [Expedite]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.