U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bravo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Disclosure]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • August 15, 2022: [Leave to Restrict]
  • August 15, 2022: [CJA]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unrestrict Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.