U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00222-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villafuerte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 17, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.