U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trombley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Leave to Restrict]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 29, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.