U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Washington et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order On Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSG Amendment 821]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disclose Grand Jury]
  • August 12, 2022: [Disclose Grand Jury]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2022: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.