U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seals
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • January 13, 2023: [Leave to Restrict]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 22, 2022: [Travel ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.