U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Avila
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss Counts]
  • March 13, 2025: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 04, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.