U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:84-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Driscoll
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order On Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • November 07, 2022: [Leave to Restrict]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order On Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • August 30, 2022: [Release from Custody]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.