U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00283-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
January, 2025
  • January 04, 2025: [Order]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [File Excess Pages]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 13, 2022: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.