U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00326-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Akindele
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: [In Limine]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Exclude]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unrestrict Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Unrestrict Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.